EP1791710 - MID-ENGINED CONVERTIBLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Lorenz Beim Steinkauz 2 49492 Westerkappeln / DE | 02 /
SCHULZ, Robert Stralsunder Strasse 71 49090 Osnabrück / DE | [2007/34] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
WEISS, Lorenz Beim Steinkauz 2 49492 Westerkappeln / DE | ||
02 /
SCHULZ, Robert Heuftgraben 10 49134 Wallenhorst / DE | |||
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
WEISS, Lorenz Giesbert-Berghoff-Strasse 32 49076 Osnabrück / DE | ||
02 /
SCHULZ, Robert Heuftgraben 10 49134 Wallenhorst / DE | Application number, filing date | 05787415.8 | 09.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005DE01577 | Priority number, date | DE20041044442 | 09.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004044442 | [2007/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006026979 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791710 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791710 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/20, B62D25/10, B62D25/24 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
B62D25/24 (EP);
B62D25/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/51] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CABRIOLET-FAHRZEUG MIT MITTELMOTOR | [2007/23] | English: | MID-ENGINED CONVERTIBLE | [2007/23] | French: | VEHICULE CABRIOLET A MOTEUR MOYEN | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.01.2009 | [2011/16] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH05112255 ; | [XY]US4712828 (ALBRECHT LEONARD N [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 33 - line 60 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 21 * * column 9, line 29 - line 45 * [Y] 5-7; | [X]US5513891 (HORIUCHI SUMIO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1-8,19 ** column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 54 *; | [Y]DE19813092 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 2a-2d * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 37 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930827), vol. 017, no. 472, Database accession no. (M - 1470), & JP05112255 A 19930507 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [Y] 5 * abstract * |