EP1811395 - HOST CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zentek Technology Japan, Inc. Dai 5 Chuo Building 2-1-2, Uchikanda, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Hiroto, c/o Zentek Techn. Japan, Inc. Dai 5 Chuo Building, 2-1-2, Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010047 / JP | 02 /
YASOSHIMA, Hiroyuki, c/o Zentek Techn. Japan, Inc Dai 5 Chuo Building, 2-1-2, Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1010047 / JP | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 Rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05787548.6 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005JP17682 | Priority number, date | JP20040281481 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004281481 | [2007/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006035738 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1811395 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F3/08, G06K17/00 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
G06F13/387 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOST-CONTROLLER | [2007/30] | English: | HOST CONTROLLER | [2007/30] | French: | CONTRÔLEUR HÔTE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | Translation filed | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 22.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0929043 (TDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US2004035939 (LIN JIN-MIN [TW]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027]; figure 5 *; | [XA]US2004186955 (TAKAHASHI TOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [A] 5-10 | International search | [X]JPH11259605 (TDK CORP); | [Y]WO0241154 (CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US], et al); | [A]JP2003076952 (TOSHIBA CORP) |