EP1794132 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF 2-CHLORO-4-NITROIMIDAZOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kanda-Tsukasacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINHAMA, Koichi, Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd 224-18, Hiraishiebisuno, Kawauchicho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 7710182 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05787645.0 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005JP18230 | Priority number, date | JP20040278974 | 27.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004278974 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006035960 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794132 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/92, C07D233/94, A61K31/4164 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
C07D233/92 (EP,KR,US);
C07D233/94 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-CHLOR-4-NITROIMIDAZOL | [2007/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF 2-CHLORO-4-NITROIMIDAZOLE | [2007/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 2-CHLORO-4-NITROIMIDAZOLE | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 01.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CA2494710 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document ** Page 7, lines 3-17 - page 8, line 1 (method 2) Scheme 3 (conversion of compound of formula (3) into compound of formula (1a)) Page 129, line 6 - line 19 example 2 *; | [DA] - SUWINSKI J ET AL, "NITROIMIDAZOLES . PART V. CHLORONITROIMIDAZOLES FROM DINITROIMIDAZOLES, A REINVESTIGATION", POLISH JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, POLISH CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1982), vol. 56, no. 10 - 12, pages 1261 - 1272, XP009048285 [DA] 1 * the whole document * * Schemes 1 and 2 * |