EP1809303 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO INHIBITING FIBROUS ADHESIONS OR INFLAMMATORY DISEASE USING LOW SULPHATE FUCANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARC Medical Devices, Inc. 102- 2386 East Mall Vancouver BC V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2013/08] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states ARC PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 102, 2386 East Mall Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASHMAN, Johanne 6070 Blenheim Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 1R1 / CA | 02 /
SPRINGATE, Christopher 556 East 12th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5T 2H5 / CA | 03 /
WINTERNITZ, Charles 7215 Montabor Drive Colorado Springs CO 80918-4757 / CA | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
CASHMAN, Johanne 6070 Blenheim Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6N 1R1 / CA | ||
02 /
SPRINGATE, Christopher 556 East 12th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5T 2H5 / CA | |||
03 /
WINTERNITZ, Charles 4576 61st Street Delta, British Columbia V4K 3L2 / CA | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2019/10] |
Former [2007/30] | Stolmár, Matthias, et al Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05788866.1 | 23.09.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005CA01446 | Priority number, date | US20040612665P | 23.09.2004 Original published format: US 612665 P | US20040612676P | 23.09.2004 Original published format: US 612676 P | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032143 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809303 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809303 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/737, A61K36/03, A61P17/02, A61P29/00, A61P43/00, A61P41/00, A61K9/70, A61K47/36, A61L31/04, C08L5/00 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/737 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (US);
A61K31/711 (US);
A61K36/03 (EP,US);
A61L31/042 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (US);
A61L2300/41 (US);
A61L2300/43 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/042, C08L5/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | A61K31/737, A61P29/00, A61P41/00, A61K31/711, A61K31/436, A61K9/70, A61K47/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/10] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG VON FIBRÖSER ADHÄSION ODER ENTZÜNDUNGSERKRANKUNG MIT NIEDERMOLEKULAREN SULFAT-FUCANEN | [2007/30] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO INHIBITING FIBROUS ADHESIONS OR INFLAMMATORY DISEASE USING LOW SULPHATE FUCANS | [2007/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET METHODES RELATIVES A L'INHIBITION D'ADHERENCES FIBREUSES OU DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES A L'AIDE DE FUCANES A BASSE TENEUR EN SULFATE | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.02.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2005 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | LU | 23.09.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 23.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | CZ | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | CZ | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 06.03.2019 | |
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | LT | 06.03.2019 | |
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 06.03.2019 | |
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 06.03.2019 | |
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 06.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2004105737 (ARC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-14,20 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0031] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0105] - [0119] * * figures 1-5 * * examples 11-15 * * claims 59-61,64-66,68,69 * * claims 71,74,75,85,89-94,96,97,99-102,106,107,113,115 * * claims 121-124,127-129 *; | [E]WO2006020994 (ANGIOTECH INT AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-8,10,11,13-20 * page 6, line 4 - line 7 * * page 7, line 25 * * page 23, line 24 - page 24, line 2 * * page 49, line 21 - line 22 * * page 51, line 19 - line 23 * * page 52, line 20 - line 28 * * page 53, line 6 - line 28 * * page 54, line 19 - line 30 * * page 55, line 1 - line 4 * * page 92, line 13 - line 19; example 15 * * page 92, line 30 - page 94, line 6 * * example 16 * * page 94, line 16 - line 21 * * page 96, line 3 - line 10 * * page 98, line 3 - line 12 * * page 98, line 26 - page 99, line 27 * * page 108, line 8 - line 14; example 19 ** claims 9,10,72,78,88,95,96 * | International search | [X]CA1297791 (ETHICON INC [US]); | [X]CA1330298 (THOMAE GMBH DR K [DE]); | [X]US5534261 (RODGERS KATHLEEN E [US], et al); | [X]CA2223573 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]); | [X]WO9724459 (ZYNAXIS INC [US]); | [X]CA2367107 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]); | [X]WO0056283 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]); | [X]CA2458853 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]); | [X]WO2004020473 (LG LIFE SCIENCES LTD [KR], et al); | by applicant | US3687808 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4904582 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US4981957 | US5023243 | US5034506 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5112963 | US5118800 | US5118802 | US5130302 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5177196 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5216141 | US5218105 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264562 | US5264564 | WO9324510 | US5272250 | US5276019 | US5278302 | US5286717 | US5292873 | US5317098 | US5319080 | US5321131 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5371241 | US5391723 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5446137 | US5451463 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5502177 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541306 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5545730 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565552 | US5567811 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5576427 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580731 | US5585481 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591722 | US5591584 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597909 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | US5663312 | US5670633 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5700920 | US5714331 | US5719262 | WO03018033 |