EP1793859 - TREATMENT OF ORAL AND INTESTINAL MUCOSITIS BY ADMINISTERING HUMAN IL-18 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/24] | METHODS OF HEALING WOUNDS BY ADMINISTERING HUMAN IL-18 | ||
[2008/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Judithann 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
DEDE, Kimberly, A. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Easeman, Richard Lewis, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Easeman, Richard Lewis, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN).25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05789011.3 | 18.08.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US29358 | Priority number, date | US20040603012P | 20.08.2004 Original published format: US 603012 P | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006023623 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793859 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793859 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61P1/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
A61K38/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/00 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | A61K45/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 19.03.2007 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG DER ORALEN UND DARM MUKOSITIS DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON MENSCHLICHEM IL-18 | [2008/44] | English: | TREATMENT OF ORAL AND INTESTINAL MUCOSITIS BY ADMINISTERING HUMAN IL-18 | [2008/43] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE LA MUCOSITE ORALE ET INTESTINALE PAR L'ADMINISTRATION D'IL-18 HUMAINE | [2008/44] |
Former [2007/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR HEILUNG VON WUNDEN DURCH VERABREICHUNG VON MENSCHLICHEM IL-18 | ||
Former [2007/24] | METHODS OF HEALING WOUNDS BY ADMINISTERING HUMAN IL-18 | ||
Former [2007/24] | PROCEDE DE CICATRISATION DE PLAIES PAR L'ADMINISTRATION D'IL-8 HUMAINE | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09155870.0 / EP2161032 | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6582689 (JOHNSON RANDALL K [US]) [Y] 4,5* claims 1,4 *; | [X]WO2004031276 (CENTOCOR INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * page 34, line 9 - line 21 * * claim 1 * * page 34, line 23 - line 29 * * page 23, line 25 - page 25, line 35 *; | [Y] - USHIO S ET AL, "CLONING OF THE CDNA FOR HUMAN IFN-GAMMA-INDUCING FACTOR, EXPRESSION IN ESCHERICHIA COLI, AND STUDIES ON THE BIOLOGIC ACTIVITIES OF THE PROTEIN", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, (19960601), vol. 156, no. 11, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 4274 - 4279, XP002022861 [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2004142037 (ENGELMAYER JOSE [US], et al); | [Y] - KAMPFER H. ET AL., "Counterregulation of Interleukin-18 mRNA and Protein Expression During Cutaneous Wound Repair in Mice", J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (1999), vol. 113, pages 369 - 374, XP003002625 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.1999.00704.x |