EP1781210 - COMPOSITE VASCULAR GRAFT INCLUDING BIOACTIVE AGENT COATING AND BIODEGRADABLE SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2009/47] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MI LYN TAN, Sharon 9 High Rock Way Allston, MA 02134 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/47] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/37] | Intes, Didier Gérard André Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/19] | Peel, James Peter Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 05789032.9 | 11.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US24418 | Priority number, date | US20040889432 | 12.07.2004 Original published format: US 889432 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006017204 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1781210 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781210 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/06 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2002/072 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | VERBUNDGEFÄSSIMPLANTAT MIT BIOAKTIVER WIRKSTOFFBESCHICHTUNG UND BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER HÜLLE | [2012/28] | English: | COMPOSITE VASCULAR GRAFT INCLUDING BIOACTIVE AGENT COATING AND BIODEGRADABLE SHEATH | [2007/19] | French: | GREFFE VASCULAIRE COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UN REVETEMENT D'AGENT BIOACTIF ET UNE GAINE BIODEGRADABLE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/19] | VERBUNDGEFÄSSIMPLANTAT MIT BIOAKTIVER WIRKSTOFFBESCHICHTUNG UND BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARER SCHLEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2005 | AT | 16.01.2013 | BE | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | IT | 16.01.2013 | LT | 16.01.2013 | LV | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | PL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | IS | 16.05.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
IT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
LV | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
BE | 16.01.2013 | ||
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
PL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 16.01.2013 | |
LT | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
IS | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 16.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9529647 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 7-9 * page 5, line 14 - line 15 *; | [A]US6379382 (YANG JUN [US]) [A] 1-24* column 5, line 9 - line 23 *; | [XY]WO02056790 (AVANTEC VASCULAR CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-24 * page 11, line 11 * * page 13, line 25 - line 27 * * page 32, line 25 - line 27 * * page 35, line 20 * * page 36, line 32 - page 37, line 9 * * figures 2d,2g,2k * [Y] 6-9; | [XY]US2003060871 (HILL JASON PETER [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] - [0029] - [0034] * * figure 6 * * claim 37 * [Y] 6; | [PA]US2004236415 (THOMAS RICHARD [US]) [PA] 1 * paragraph [0041] * |