EP1782129 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEVELOPMENT OF LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Koji 14-23, Fujimi-cho Tatebayashi, Gunma 374-0027 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Chiaki 1-35-2, Takada, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0033 / JP | 03 /
HAYAKAWA, Eiji 15-1, Sumiyoshi-cho Utsunomiya, Tochigi 320-0864 / JP | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/26] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Départment Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2007/19] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W93-2), Headstone Drive, Harrow Middlesex, HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05789143.4 | 23.08.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US29799 | Priority number, date | JP20040245853 | 25.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004245853 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006026229 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782129 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1782129 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/30, G03D3/04, B41C1/10 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
B41C1/10 (EP,US);
G03F7/3007 (EP,US);
G03F7/3014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWICKLUNG EINES FLACHDRUCKPLATTENVORLÄUFERS | [2007/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DEVELOPMENT OF LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR | [2007/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LE DEVELOPPEMENT DE PRECURSEUR DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1340042 (KODAK LTD) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1439029 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1 * page 1, line 10 - line 67 * * example - *; | [X]EP0095416 (PHOTOMECA SA [FR]) [X] 1,7-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4549944 (PLIEFKE ENGELBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 47 * * examples 2,4,5 *; | [X]US4555302 (URBANIK JOHN C [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 49 *; | [X]EP0346871 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * claims 1-4,11-13 * * figures 1,4 * * column 1, line 18 - line 25 * * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 16 *; | [X]EP0423782 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 8-13 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 4 ** figure - *; | [X]WO9418005 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4 * * example 2.7 *; | [X]US5555234 (SUGIMOTO KENJI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 42 *; | [X]US2002055049 (WATANABE MINORU [JP]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] * | by applicant | JPS4841708B | JPS5421726B | JPS57196231 | JPH01165613 | JPH02226149 | EP0931647 | JP2001305722 | JP2002079772 |