|
01.06.2011 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
17.11.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2007 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Deficiencies concerning the deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
19.12.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.12.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.12.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.12.2006 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2006 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.06.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.05.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.05.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.05.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.05.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Fax filed during the PCT2 procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.05.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.05.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.05.2006 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
76 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
2 |