19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
28.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
03.06.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
06.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
18.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
25.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
18.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
25.06.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
15.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.06.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.02.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
20.11.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.09.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2009 |
First examination report |
|
26.05.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.09.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
16.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
23.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
23.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
07.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|