EP1776387 - ANGIOGENIC AND IMMUNOLOGIC APPLICATIONS OF ANTI-CD160 SPECIFIC COMPOUNDS OBTAINABLE FROM MAB CL1-R2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | [2010/30] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101 rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENSUSSAN, Armand 16 rue Auguste Lançon F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
BOUMSELL, Laurence 35, quai de Grenelle F-75015 PARIS / FR | 03 /
LE BOUTEILLER, Philippe 4, rue Toulouse-Lautrec F-31700 Blagnac / FR | [2007/17] | Representative(s) | Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Touati, Catherine Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05789182.2 | 09.08.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005EP09231 | Priority number, date | EP20040292015 | 09.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04292015 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006015886 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776387 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776387 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P31/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2836 (US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANGIOGENISCHE UND IMMUNOLOGISCHE VERWENDUNGEN VON ANTI-CD160 SPEZIFISCHEN STOFFEN, ERHÄLTLICH VOM MONOKLONALEN ANTIKÖPER CL1-R2 | [2007/17] | English: | ANGIOGENIC AND IMMUNOLOGIC APPLICATIONS OF ANTI-CD160 SPECIFIC COMPOUNDS OBTAINABLE FROM MAB CL1-R2 | [2007/17] | French: | APPLICATIONS ANGIOGENIQUES ET IMMUNOLOGIQUES DE COMPOSES SPECIFIQUES ANTI-CD160 POUVANT ETRE OBTENUS A PARTIR DE L'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL CL1-R2 | [2010/10] |
Former [2007/17] | APPLICATIONS ANGIOGÉNIQUES ET IMMUNOLOGIQUES DE COMPOSÉS SPÉCIFIQUES ANTI-CD160 POUVANT ÊTRE OBTENUS À PARTIR DE L'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL CL1-R2 | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | LT | 28.07.2010 | LV | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | IE | 09.08.2010 | LU | 09.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | IS | 28.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
LV | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
IS | 28.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | FI | 28.07.2010 | |
LT | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 28.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9821240 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-53 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03018048 (ABTECH [FR], et al) [X] 1-53 * the whole document *; | [X] - LASO F J ET AL, "Alterations in tumor necrosis factor-alpha, interferon-gamma, and interleukin-6 production by natural killer cell-enriched peripheral blood mononuclear cells in chronic alcoholism: relationship with liver disease and ethanol intake.", ALCOHOLISM, CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RESEARCH. OCT 1997, (199710), vol. 21, no. 7, ISSN 0145-6008, pages 1226 - 1231, XP009043061 [X] 52 * page 1228, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1228, column L, paragraph 4 - page 1230, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000374-199710000-00011 | [A] - LE BOUTEILLER PHILIPPE ET AL, "Engagement of CD160 receptor by HLA-C is a triggering mechanism used by circulating natural killer (NK) cells to mediate cytotoxicity.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20021224), vol. 99, no. 26, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 16963 - 16968, XP002315421 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.012681099 | [A] - AGRAWAL S ET AL, "Cutting edge: MHC class I triggering by a novel cell surface ligand costimulates proliferation of activated human T cells.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 FEB 1999, (19990201), vol. 162, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1223 - 1226, XP002315422 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * | [T] - BARAKONYI ALIZ ET AL, "Cutting edge: engagement of CD160 by its HLA-C physiological ligand triggers a unique cytokine profile secretion in the cytotoxic peripheral blood NK cell subset.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 NOV 2004, (20041101), vol. 173, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 5349 - 5354, XP002315423 [T] 1-53 * the whole document * | [A] - ANUMANTHAN A ET AL, "Cloning of BY55, a novel Ig superfamily member expressed on NK cells, CTL, and intestinal intraepithelial lymphocytes.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 15 SEP 1998, (19980915), vol. 161, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 2780 - 2790, XP002315424 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * | [A] - NIKOLOVA MARIA ET AL, "BY55/CD160 acts as a co-receptor in TCR signal transduction of a human circulating cytotoxic effector T lymphocyte subset lacking CD28 expression.", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY. MAY 2002, (200205), vol. 14, no. 5, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 445 - 451, XP002315425 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/14.5.445 | [A] - BD BIOSCIENCES, "Fluorescein isothiocyanate (FITC)-conjugated mouse anti-human CD160 monoclonal antibody", (20011019), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.bdbiosciences.com/external_files/pm/doc/tds/human/live/web_enabled/38484X_551888.pdf, (20050103), XP002315772 [A] 1-53 * the whole document * |