EP1794299 - HOST-VECTOR SYSTEM FOR ANTIBIOTIC-FREE COLE1 PLASMID PROPAGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim RCV GmbH & Co KG Dr. Boehringer-Gasse 5-11 1121 Wien / AT | [2008/50] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Austria GmbH Dr. Boehringer-Gasse 5-11 1121 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRABHERR, Reingard Ludwig-Kaiserstrasse 11 3021 Pressbaum / AT | 02 /
PFAFFENZELLER, Irene Mariahilferstrasse 74a/11 1070 Wien / AT | [2014/28] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
GRABHERR, Reingard Ludwig-Kaiserstrasse 11 A-3021 PRESSBAUM / AT | ||
02 /
PFAFFENZELLER, Irene Mariahilferstrasse 74a/11 A-1070 WIEN / AT | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/50] | Hammann, Heinz, et al Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH CD-Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH, CD-Patents, Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 05789661.5 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005EP54450 | Priority number, date | EP20040022201 | 17.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04022201 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006029985 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794299 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1794299 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/70 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WIRT-VEKTOR-SYSTEM ZUR ANTIBIOTIKA-FREIEN VERMEHRUNG VON COLE1-PLASMIDEN | [2007/24] | English: | HOST-VECTOR SYSTEM FOR ANTIBIOTIC-FREE COLE1 PLASMID PROPAGATION | [2007/24] | French: | SYSTÈME HÔTE-VECTEUR POUR LA PROPAGATION SANS ANTIBIOTIQUES DES PLASMIDES DE TYPE COLE1 | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 03.08.2007 | Observations by third parties | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 18.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2005 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | IE | 08.09.2015 | LU | 08.09.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 08.09.2005 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 08.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9402607 (CELLTECH LTD [GB], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO03000881 (ISAKSSON LEIF [SE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - HISZCZYNSKA-SAWICKA ELZBIETA ET AL, "Effect of integration host factor on RNA II synthesis in replication of plasmid containing orip15A", PLASMID, (199809), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0147-619X, pages 150 - 157, XP002316098 [X] 1,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/plas.1998.1361 | [A] - HAGG PETER ET AL, "A host/plasmid system that is not dependent on antibiotics and antibiotic resistance genes for stable plasmid maintenance in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20040701), vol. 111, no. 1, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 17 - 30, XP002316099 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2004.03.010 | Examination | WO2005052167 | - CRANENBURGH R M ET AL, "Escherichia coli strains that allow antibiotic-free plasmid selection and maintenance by repressor titration", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/NAR/29.5.E26, (20010301), vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 0305-1048, page E26, XP002253525 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.5.e26 | - PICHLER S., "Produktion resistenzfreier Plasmide für den therapeutischen EInsatz von DNA im Bereich der Humanmedizin", MASTER THESIS FROM UNIVERISITY OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND AND LIFE SCIENCES, Vienna, (200008), pages 1 - 43 | other | WO2005052167 |