EP1794857 - CABLE ENTRY DEVICE FOR A HOUSING WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murrplastik Systemtechnik GmbH Fabrikstrasse 10 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSS, Eckard Im Flieder 16 71554 Weissach im Tal / DE | 02 /
SOHN, Wolfgang Winnender Strasse 31/1 71404 Korb / DE | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Reule, Hanspeter, et al Wolf Pfiz & Gauss Patentanwälte Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Reule, Hanspeter, et al Patentanwälte, Wolf & Lutz, Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05789879.3 | 28.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005EP10443 | Priority number, date | DE20041048055 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004048055 | [2007/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037522 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794857 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1794857 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/30 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H02B1/305 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KABELEINFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE GEHÄUSEWAND | [2007/24] | English: | CABLE ENTRY DEVICE FOR A HOUSING WALL | [2007/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INTRODUCTION DE CABLE DESTINE A UNE PAROI DE BOITIER | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 20.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | AT | 28.09.2009 | LU | 28.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
AT | 28.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
AT | 28.09.2009 | ||
LU | 28.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
AT | 28.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2633187 (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G) [X] 1-16 * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 11, line 1 - page 14, line 2; figure - *; | [X]US5422436 (ZACHRAI JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1-16 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]DE29723533U (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [A] 7-13* figure - *; | [X]DE10112110 (LAMPERTZ FAB ORG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0014] , [0015] , [0028] , [0030] , [0031]; figure - * |