18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
11.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
24.02.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] |
20.01.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.01.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.09.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
02.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
01.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
28.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
11.05.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
11.05.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
16.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|