EP1791681 - METHOD FOR BREAKING ROCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Mining and Construction Oy Pihtisulunkatu 9 33330 Tampere / FI | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KESKINIVA, Markku Riskiniva 32-34 D 31, FI-33310 Tampere / FI | 02 /
MÄKI, Jorma Sorvajärventie 35 FI-34140 Mutala / FI | 03 /
AHOLA, Erkki Topiaksentie 11 FI-36240 Kangasala / FI | 04 /
ESKO, Mauri Kolkontie 174 FI-39500 Ikaalinen / FI | 05 /
HELIN, Aimo Lannemäentie 49 F 14 FI-33340 Tampere / FI | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05789926.2 | 23.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005FI50326 | Priority number, date | FI20040005353 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: FI 20045353 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032734 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791681 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791681 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25D9/00, E21B1/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
E21B1/28 (EP,KR,US);
B25D9/00 (KR);
E21B44/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BRECHEN VON GESTEIN | [2007/23] | English: | METHOD FOR BREAKING ROCK | [2007/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONCASSAGE DE ROCHE | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | LV | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | LU | 23.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | BE | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
LU | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | BE | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
LU | 23.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | BE | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | BE | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | BE | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | BE | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2642133 (RUHRKOHLE AG); | [Y]WO9726090 (BOART LONGYEAR TECHNICAL CENTR [IE], et al); | [Y]GB2328342 (BOART LONGYEAR TECHNICAL CENTR [IE]); | [X]US6454021 (WATANABE HIDESHI [JP]); | [Y]WO03095153 (SANDVIK TAMROCK OY [FI], et al) |