EP1799311 - COMPOSITIONS WITH INHIBITORS OF THE SYNTHESIS OF PROSTAGLANDIN AND/OR OF LEUKOTRIENE IN CONJUNCTION WITH STIMULATORS OF THE RELEASE OF CUTANEOUS NEUROMEDIATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖRING, Thomas Waldstr. 1 41542 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
TRÄGER, Anemone Borsigstrasse 7 40227 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
ANDERHEGGEN, Bernd Kampstrasse 113 42781 Haan / DE | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
DÖRING, Thomas Waldstr. 1 41542 Dormagen / DE | ||
02 /
TRÄGER, Anemone Kallenbachstrasse 6 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03 /
ANDERHEGGEN, Bernd Kampstrasse 113 42781 Haan / DE | Application number, filing date | 05790088.8 | 29.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP10524 | Priority number, date | DE20041050560 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050560 | DE20051000868 | 05.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005000868 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006042625 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1799311 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08, A61K8/44, A61K8/60, A61K8/64, A61K8/73, A61K8/49, A61K8/92, A61K8/97, A61K8/99, A61P17/04 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A61Q19/007 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/4986 (EP);
A61K8/585 (EP);
A61K8/60 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61K8/73 (EP);
A61K8/733 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61K8/9711 (EP,US);
A61K8/9728 (EP,US);
A61K8/9761 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61Q1/14 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q19/004 (EP);
A61Q19/005 (EP);
A61Q19/02 (EP);
A61Q19/04 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT INHIBITOREN DER PROSTAGLANDIN-UND/ODER LEUKOTRIEN-SYNTHESE IN KOMBINATION MIT STIMULATOREN DER FREISETZUNG KUTAREN NEUROMEDIATOREN | [2007/26] | English: | COMPOSITIONS WITH INHIBITORS OF THE SYNTHESIS OF PROSTAGLANDIN AND/OR OF LEUKOTRIENE IN CONJUNCTION WITH STIMULATORS OF THE RELEASE OF CUTANEOUS NEUROMEDIATORS | [2007/26] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS DE LA SYNTHESE DE LA PROSTAGLANDINE ET/OU DU LEUCOTRIENE EN COMBINAISON AVEC DES STIMULATEURS DE LIBERATION DE NEUROMEDIATEURS CUTANES | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2848851 (SILAB SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,10-15 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 7 * * examples 3,4 * * claims 1-7 * [Y] 1-3,6,7,10-15; | [XY]US6579543 (MCCLUNG JACKIE H [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,11-15 * column 1, line 44 - line 53 * * column 2, line 25 - line 38 * * example - * * claim 1 * [Y] 1-3,6,7,10-15; | [DXY]FR2842201 (PROBEST [FR]) [DX] 1 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 4, line 1 - line 9 * * page 5, line 1 - line 4 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 11 * * examples I,IV,VI * * claim - * [Y] 1-3,6,7,10-15; | [Y]US4749573 (BONNE CLAUDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10-15 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO9807744 (SEDERMA SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10-15 * the whole document *; | [T]DE20313959U (BLOCK ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [T]DE102004017376 (BRAUN GMBH [DE]) |