EP1784755 - METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING DESIGN, DELIVERY AND IMPLIMENTATION OF INNOVATIVE PRODUCTS IN HEALTHCARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERPICHBOEHM, Bernd Baldurstrasse 53 68305 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
KASPAR, Peter Angermaierstrasse 14 82362 Weilheim / DE | 03 /
OBERLAENDER, Uwe In der Lehmenkaut 3 67271 Kleinkarlbach / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Herren, Barbara, et al Roche Diagnostics AG Patent Department Forrenstrasse 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Herren, Barbara, et al Roche Diagnostics AG Forrentstrasse 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | Application number, filing date | 05790333.8 | 24.08.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP09128 | Priority number, date | EP20040020112 | 25.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04020112 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006021431 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784755 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G16H70/20 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON DESIGN, LIEFERUNG UND IMPLEMENTIERUNG INNOVATIVER GESUNDHEITSPRODUKTE | [2007/20] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMIZING DESIGN, DELIVERY AND IMPLIMENTATION OF INNOVATIVE PRODUCTS IN HEALTHCARE | [2007/20] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR OPTIMISER LA CONCEPTION, LA LIVRAISON ET L'EXÉCUTION DE PRODUITS INNOVATEURS DANS LES SOINS DE SANTÉ | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6108635 (HERREN L TANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 11 - column 8, line 17 * * column 9, line 43 - column 44, line 26 *; | [A]US6283761 (JOAO RAYMOND ANTHONY [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 30 - column 11, line 18 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002128866 (GOETZKE GARY A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, paragraph 9 ** page 2, paragraph 26 - page 11, paragraph 105 *; | [X]WO03019455 (KEYSTONE THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 13 * * page 6, line 9 - page 16, line 17 * |