Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
25.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.10.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.10.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.12.2007 | Change - designated states | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
21.12.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
25.10.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.06.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
15.06.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
07.06.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.05.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.08.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.08.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.12.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |