EP1808131 - ELECTRONIC RADIAL TYPE ULTRASONIC VIBRATOR, AND ULTRASONIC ENDOSCOPE AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKABAYASHI, Katsuhiro 2-36-7, Akatsukicho, Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920043 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA, Yukihiko 1-14-13-804, Ho, Yoshikawa-shi, Saitama 3420041 / JP | 03 /
MIZUNUMA, Akiko 9-18-1101, Shincho, Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920065 / JP | 04 /
IMAHASHI, Takuya 3-13-2, Sugesengoku, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2140006 / JP | 05 /
SATO, Sunao 2974-24-308, Ishikawacho, Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920032 / JP | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05790554.9 | 05.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005JP18430 | Priority number, date | JP20040301294 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004301294 | JP20050018481 | 26.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005018481 | [2007/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040972 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808131 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP);
A61B8/445 (EP);
A61B8/4483 (EP);
B06B1/0633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/04] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHER ULTRASCHALLVIBRATOR VOM RADIALTYP UND ULTRASCHALLENDOSKOP UND SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/29] | English: | ELECTRONIC RADIAL TYPE ULTRASONIC VIBRATOR, AND ULTRASONIC ENDOSCOPE AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2007/29] | French: | VIBRATEUR ULTRASONORE ELECTRONIQUE DE TYPE RADIAL ET ENDOSCOPE ULTRASONORE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | Translation filed | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 03.03.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2003522007 ; | [A]JP2002336258 ; | [A]JPH08172695 ; | [A]JPH04166139 |