EP1819384 - SYRINGE WITH DOSIS MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKUSSEN, Tom, Hede Skovalléen 19 DK-2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2007/34] | Application number, filing date | 05790720.6 | 13.10.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005DK00659 | Priority number, date | DK20040001576 | 14.10.2004 Original published format: DK 200401576 | EP20050009101 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05009101 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006039930 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819384 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/20 (EP,US);
A61M5/3155 (EP,US);
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M5/31563 (EP,US);
A61M5/31571 (EP,US);
A61M5/31585 (EP,US);
A61M2005/202 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2026 (EP,US);
A61M5/31535 (EP,US);
A61M5/31536 (EP,US);
A61M5/3156 (EP,US);
A61M5/3158 (EP,US);
A61M5/31595 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZE MIT DOSISMECHANISMUS | [2007/34] | English: | SYRINGE WITH DOSIS MECHANISM | [2007/34] | French: | SERINGUE AVEC MECHANISME DE DOSAGE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004028598 (SHL MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 6, line 19 - page 19, line 9; figures 1-19B *; | [X]US2002120235 (ENGGAARD CHRISTIAN [DK]) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0043] - [0072]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US6413242 (MICHEL PETER [CH], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-6 *; | [XD]WO9938554 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [XD] 1-22 * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 19; figures 6-10 *; | [X]WO9422507 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 1-22 * page 23, line 3 - page 30, line 13; figures 24-59 *; | [A]WO9903522 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0338806 (TURNER ROBERT CHARLES [GB], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 47 - column 7, line 15; figures 1-3 * |