EP1796484 - CONFECTIONERY PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Opposition rejected | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fertin Pharma A/S Dandyvej 19 7100 Vejle / DK | [2017/01] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Gumlink A/S Dandyvej 19 7100 Vejle / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND, Kirsten Bøgeskovvejen 10 DK-7130 Juelsminde / DK | 02 /
TOPSØE, Martin Mejsevej 5 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Olesen, Kaj Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [2007/25] | Olesen, Kaj Patentgruppen, Arosgaarden, Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 05790923.6 | 10.10.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005DK00650 | Priority number, date | WO2004DK00691 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: PCT/DK2004/000691 | WO2005DK00335 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: PCT/DK2005/000335 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037343 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796484 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1796484 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
A23G3/36 (EP);
A23G4/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | SÜSSWARE | [2007/25] | English: | CONFECTIONERY PRODUCT | [2007/25] | French: | PRODUIT DE CONFISERIE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Wm. Wrigley Jr. Company 1132 W Blackhawk Street Chicago IL 60642 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.02.2015
ADMISSIBLE Wm. Wrigley Jr. Company 1132 W Blackhawk Street Chicago IL 60642 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | 24.03.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.08.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2018 | 13.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.07.2018 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.08.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2005 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | IE | 10.10.2014 | LU | 10.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 10.10.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 10.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004028267 (GUMLINK A/S; ANDERSEN, LONE; WITTORF, HELLE) [X] 1-69 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO02076231 (DANDY A/S; WITTORFF, HELLE; ANDERSEN, LONE; STOREY, ROBSON) [X] 1-69 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9620609 (WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY) [X] 1-69 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5116626 (SYNOSKY ET AL) [X] 1-69 * example -; claims 24-34 *; | [X]EP0372695 (WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY) [X] 1-69 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5023093 (CHERUKURI ET AL) [X] 1-69 * claim - *; | [X]US4794003 (CHERUKURI ET AL) [X] 1-69 * claim - *; | [X]US4518615 (CHERUKURI ET AL) [X] 1-69 * claim - *; | [X]US5110608 (CHERUKURI ET AL) [X] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004004480 (GUMLINK A/S; THORENGAARD, BITTEN; BOESEN, DORTHE, SCHACKINGER; NISSEN,) [X] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2796813 (SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DES OLEAGINEUX) [X] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [A]US4486452 (CLOUD ET AL) [A] 1-69 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004013776 (WHITEHOUSE ANDREW STEVE ET AL) [A] 1-69 * the whole document * |