EP1817666 - METHOD FOR BURNING IN THE MULTI-DISSEMINATION OF DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES 45 Rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTER, Marc, THALES INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY 31-33 avenue Aristide Briand F-94117 ARCUEIL Cedex / FR | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Esselin, Sophie, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Esselin, Sophie, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2007/33] | Chaverneff, Vladimir, et al Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05791979.7 | 14.10.2005 | [2007/33] | WO2005EP55270 | Priority number, date | FR20040010952 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0410952 | [2007/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040353 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1817666 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
G06F9/465 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BRENNEN IN DER MEHRFACHVERBREITUNG VON VERTEILTEN OBJEKTEN | [2007/33] | English: | METHOD FOR BURNING IN THE MULTI-DISSEMINATION OF DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS | [2007/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE FIABILISATION DE LA MULTI-DIFFUSION D'OBJETS DISTRIBUES | [2007/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/24] | 06.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.01.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003217128 (YANOSY JOHN ANTHONY) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]US6023579 (HELLGREN ET AL) [A] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]US5732270 (FOODY ET AL) [A] 1-7 * column W * | [Y] - ORVALHO J ET AL, "Augmented reliable multicast CORBA Event Service (ARMS): a QoS-adaptive middleware", INTERACTIVE DISTRIBUTED MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.1905) SPRINGER VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (2000), ISBN 3-540-41130-5, pages 144 - 157, XP002337046 [Y] 1-7 * page 3, line 13 - line 20 * * page 5, line 10 - line 12 * * page 7, line 20 - line 23 * * page 9, line 1 - line 6 * | [Y] - STÉPHANE LOUIS DIT PICARD, SAMUEL DEGRANDE, CHRISTOPHE GRANSART, "A CORBA based platform as communication support for synchronous Collaborative Virtual Environment", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA MIDDLEWARE, (200110), URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/990000/985153/p56-picard.pdf?key1=985153&key2=6323681211&coll=portal&dl=ACM&CFID=2181828&CFTOKEN=68827537, (20050719), XP002337049 [Y] 1-7 * page 57 * * page 58, column R, line 17 - line 34 * | [A] - ORVALHO J ET AL, "Augmented Reliable Multicast CORBA Event Service: a multimedia middleware", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2001), vol. 4209, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 183 - 190, XP002337045 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - ORVALHO J ET AL, "Evaluating light-weight reliable multicast protocol extensions to the CORBA event service", PROCEEDINGS THIRD INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISE DISTRIBUTED OBJECT COMPUTING. CONFERENCE (CAT. NO.99EX366) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (1999), ISBN 0-7803-5784-1, pages 255 - 261, XP002337047 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - ORVALHO J ET AL, "A platform for the study of reliable multicasting extensions to CORBA Event Service", INTERACTIVE DISTRIBUTED MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS AND TELECOMMUNICATION SERVICES. 6TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, IDMS'99. PROCEEDINGS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.1718) SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (1999), ISBN 3-540-66595-1, pages 107 - 120, XP002337048 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | - "Augmented reliable multicast CORBA Event Service (ARMS) : a QoS-adaptive middleware « Interactive Distributed Multimedia Systems and Telecommunications Services", ORVALHO J ET AL., lecture notes in Computer Science, SPRINGER VERLAG, vol. 1905, pages 144 - 157 |