EP1956934 - BELT AND BUCKLE FOR A BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Handelsonderneming Bauhuis "Hob"B.V. Wijnkamp 28 7471 CC Goor / NL | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUHUIS, Marinus, Bernardus Eeftinkstraat 12 NL-7496 AG Hengelvelde / NL | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Baeten, Ernest Henricus Alfonsus, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Baeten, Ernest, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05792048.0 | 06.10.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005NL00718 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007040383 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956934 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1956934 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A44B11/12, A44B11/22 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
A44B11/12 (EP,US);
A44B11/06 (EP,US);
A44B11/223 (EP,US);
Y10T24/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GÜRTEL UND GÜRTELSCHNALLE | [2008/34] | English: | BELT AND BUCKLE FOR A BELT | [2008/34] | French: | CEINTURE ET BOUCLE DE CEINTURE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.2009 | CY | 17.06.2009 | CZ | 17.06.2009 | DK | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | IT | 17.06.2009 | LT | 17.06.2009 | LV | 17.06.2009 | NL | 17.06.2009 | PL | 17.06.2009 | RO | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | TR | 17.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | SE | 17.09.2009 | GR | 18.09.2009 | ES | 28.09.2009 | GB | 06.10.2009 | IE | 06.10.2009 | LU | 06.10.2009 | IS | 17.10.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
GB | 06.10.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
LU | 06.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
GB | 06.10.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
LU | 06.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
IT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
GB | 06.10.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
GB | 06.10.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
GR | 18.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IE | 06.10.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
CZ | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
RO | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | ||
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
PL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SE | 17.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1502771 (GOVIS NICKETAS C) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 37 - page 1, line 85; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US1836678 (MORSE WILLIAM J) [A] 1-8* page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 60; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US4369529 (YAHATA EIJI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 5; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5572747 (CHENG JUEI-HSIANG [TW]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 51; figures 1-4 * |