EP1863884 - LIQUID VISCOUS PRODUCT BASED ON AN ORGANOFUNCTIONAL SILANE SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING WEATHERING-STABILE PROTECTIVE COATINGS FOR PREVENTING SURFACE SOILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Bennigsenplatz 1 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANDKE, Burkharad Chrischonastrasse 25 79540 Lörrach / DE | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Bendele, Tanja RUHR-IP Patentanwälte Brucker Holt 58 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Bendele, Tanja RUHR -IP Patentanwälte Markuspfad 2-4 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05792195.9 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/50] | WO2005EP54422 | Priority number, date | DE20041053384 | 02.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053384 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006048348 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863884 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863884 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09D183/08, C04B41/49, C07F7/18 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C09D183/08 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4961 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C04B2111/25 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B14/06 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (US,EP);
C09D4/00, C08G77/22 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGES VISKOSES PRODUKT AUF GRUNDLAGE EINES ORGANOFUNKTIONELLEN SILANSYSTEMS ZUR HERSTELLUNG WETTERBESTÄNDIGER SCHUTZBESCHICHTUNGEN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON OBERFLÄCHENVERSCHMUTZUNG | [2007/50] | English: | LIQUID VISCOUS PRODUCT BASED ON AN ORGANOFUNCTIONAL SILANE SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING WEATHERING-STABILE PROTECTIVE COATINGS FOR PREVENTING SURFACE SOILING | [2007/50] | French: | PRODUIT VISQUEUX LIQUIDE RENFERMANT UN SYSTEME SILANE ORGANOFONCTIONNEL DESTINE A LA PRODUCTION DE REVETEMENTS DE PROTECTION RESISTANTS AUX AGENTS ATMOSPHERIQUES POUR EVITER LES SALISSURES DE SURFACE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 07.08.2007 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 26.10.2007 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.08.2012 | 28.08.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2005 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | IT | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.09.2005 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6387166 (ABELE BORS C [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,12,14-18 * claims 1,2 * * column 13, line 21 - line 46 *; | [X]EP1386951 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7,14-18 * claims 1,10 * * figure 1 * * example 1 * * page 26, lines 7-12 *; | [DY]EP0960021 (SEYDEL RESEARCH INC [US]) [DY] 1-18 * claim - *; | [DY]EP1101787 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [DY] 1-18 * claim - *; | [DY]EP0846717 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [DY] 1-18 * claim - *; | [Y]FR2684682 (COPPA CIE [FR]) [Y] 1-18 * claims 1,2,11,12 * | by applicant | EP1101787 | EP0960921 | EP0856717 | EP0846716 | EP0846717 |