EP1805702 - COMPUTER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZED PROVISION OF MANUFACTURED PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Océ Printing Systems GmbH & Co. KG Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | [2013/37] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states OCE Printing Systems GmbH Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIETSCH, Anton 33E Chancery Lane 01-15 Chancery Residence Singapore 309555 / SG | 02 /
PFISTERER, Alfred Münchner Strasse 158 83703 Gmund / DE | 03 /
CZEMPIK, Uve Schulstrasse 38 83527 Haag / DE | 04 /
PETRASCHKA, Peter Eichenweg 7 82541 St. Heinrich / DE | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
PIETSCH, Anton 33E Chancery Lane Singapore 309555 / SG | ||
02 /
PFISTERER, Alfred Münchner Strasse 158 83703 Gmund / DE | |||
03 /
CZEMPIK, Uve Schulstrasse 38 83527 Haag / DE | |||
04 /
PETRASCHKA, Peter Eichenweg 7 82541 St. Heinrich / DE | |||
Former [2007/28] | 01 /
PIETSCH, Anton Gräfin-Justitia-Strasse 8 b 82544 Egling / DE | ||
02 /
PFISTERER, Alfred Münchner Strasse 158 83703 Gmund / DE | |||
03 /
CZEMPIK, Uve Schulstrasse 38 83527 Haag / DE | |||
04 /
PETRASCHKA, Peter Eichenweg 7 82541 St. Heinrich / DE | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05793000.0 | 27.09.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005EP10426 | Priority number, date | DE20041047328 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004047328 | [2007/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006034842 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805702 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERTEN BEREITSTELLUNG VON FERTIGUNGSTEILEN | [2007/28] | English: | COMPUTER SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPTIMIZED PROVISION OF MANUFACTURED PARTS | [2007/28] | French: | SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE, ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR DE MANIERE OPTIMALISEE DES PIECES MANUFACTUREES | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |