EP1784636 - PASSIVE WIRELESS SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE CHEMICAL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, James 8924 Putter Belvidere, IL 61008 / US | 02 /
REPKO, Mark, A. 2621 McLeay Drive Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 03 /
DIERAUER, Peter, P. 2277 Shepard Drive Freeport, IL 61032 / US | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
LIU, James 2705 Stowmarket Market Rockford, IL 61109 / US | ||
02 /
REPKO, Mark, A. 661 Barley Ridge Trail Freeport, IL 61032 / US | |||
03 /
DIERAUER, Peter, P. 2277 Shepard Drive Freeport, IL 61032 / US | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05793285.7 | 02.09.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005US31336 | Priority number, date | US20040933945 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: US 933945 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006028974 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784636 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/02, G01N29/24, G01S13/75, H03H9/02 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G01S13/755 (EP,US);
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
G01N29/2462 (EP,US);
G01N2291/011 (EP,US);
G01N2291/014 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0256 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/50] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PASSIVER DRAHTLOSER CHEMISCHER SENSOR FÜR AKUSTISCHE OBERFLÄCHENWELLEN | [2007/20] | English: | PASSIVE WIRELESS SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE CHEMICAL SENSOR | [2007/20] | French: | SONDE CHIMIQUE A ONDES SONORES SUPERFICIELLES SANS FIL PASSIVE | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 26.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0054042 (MARCONI APPLIED TECHN LTD [GB], et al); | [X]US6144332 (REINDL LEONHARD [DE], et al); | [X]US2003154031 (POTYRAILO RADISLAV ALEXANDROVI [US], et al); | [X]US2003196477 (AUNER GREGORY W [US], et al); |