EP1801841 - IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hajime c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
INAMURA, Masaaki c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05793635.3 | 13.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP18868 | Priority number, date | JP20040302013 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004302013 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006041129 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801841 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12, H01J29/28 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H01J29/90 (EP,US);
H01J1/30 (KR);
H01J29/085 (EP,US);
H01J29/28 (KR);
H01J31/12 (KR);
H01J31/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/04] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2007/26] | English: | IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE | [2007/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF D' AFFICHAGE D' IMAGE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2007 | Translation filed | 23.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 21.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000251797 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2001243893 (SONY CORP); | [XP]JP2005235470 (CANON KK) |