EP1815263 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE SYSTEM WITH REDUCED NOISE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY, Paul, R. Landheuvel 5 NL-5685 BC Best / NL | 02 /
FONKEN, Adrianus, M., J., M. Tilburgseweg 12 NL-5081 NJ Hilvarenbeek / NL | 03 /
LIMPENS, Patrick, W., P. Lentemorgen 32 NL-5406 AM Uden / NL | 04 /
DOYLE, Terry, M. 89 Trumbull Drive Hudson, OH 44236 / US | 05 /
AMOR, William, H. 9744 Whisperwood Circle Chagrin Falls, OH 44023 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/32] | Cohen, Julius Simon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05793839.1 | 14.10.2005 | [2007/32] | WO2005IB53387 | Priority number, date | EP20040105824 | 17.11.2004 Original published format: EP 04105824 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006054187 | Date: | 26.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1815263 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/385 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
G01R33/3854 (EP);
G01R33/3856 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETRESONANZSYSTEM MIT REDUZIERTER LAUTSTÄRKE | [2007/32] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE SYSTEM WITH REDUCED NOISE | [2007/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE AVEC REDUCTION DU BRUIT | [2007/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003016018 (ARZ WINFRIED) [X] 1-23 * page 1, paragraphs 9-11 - page 2, paragraphs 17,19-29; figures 1-5 *; | [XA]US2002105330 (DROBNITZKY MATTHIAS) [X] 1,21-23 * page 1, paragraph 8; figure 1; claims 1-11 * [A] 2-20; | [XA]US2004196041 (DROBNITZKY MATTHIAS) [X] 1,21-23 * page 2, paragraphs 22,23 - page 2, paragraphs 28-31; claims 8-15 * [A] 2-20; | [X]EP1193507 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [X] 1 * page 10, paragraphs 36,38 - page 11, paragraph 41 *; | [DA]US6043653 (TAKAMORI ET AL) [DA] 1-23 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 4-7; figure 2 * |