EP1807249 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROFILING TREE TRUNKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBRÜDER LINCK GMBH & CO. KG "GATTERLINCK" MASCHINENFABRIK Appenweierer Strasse 48 77704 Oberkirch / DE | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Hermann Ödsbacher Strasse 34 77794 Lautenbach / DE | 02 /
MAIER, Robert Friedenstrasse 41 77781 Biberach / DE | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Blumenröhr, Dietrich, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 05793988.6 | 01.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005EP10623 | Priority number, date | DE20041051933 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051933 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045403 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1807249 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1807249 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B27L11/00, B27B33/20 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B27B7/02 (EP,US);
B27B1/007 (EP,US);
B27B33/20 (EP,US);
B27L11/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM PROFILIEREN VON BAUMSTÄMMEN | [2007/29] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROFILING TREE TRUNKS | [2007/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR PROFILER DES TRONCS D'ARBRE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | IE | 19.11.2008 | LT | 19.11.2008 | LV | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | IS | 19.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | LT | 19.11.2008 | |
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3702890 (LINCK MASCH GATTERLINCK [DE]) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]US4794964 (WOLF JOHANN [AT]) [X] 1-3,13,15-22 * column 2, lines 25-28; figure - *; | [X]DE4419325 (DIETZ HANS PROF DR [DE]) [X] 1-22 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [X]WO9533603 (STROJCAD S R O [SK], et al) [X] 1-3,15-22 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0744255 (LINCK MASCH GATTERLINCK [DE]) [A] 1-22 * abstract *; | [AD]DE19960319 (DIETZ HANS [DE]) [AD] 1-22* the whole document * |