EP1802924 - CHARGE MANAGEMENT FOR 100% HEAT RECOVERY UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, CT 06034-4015 / US | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06034-4015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGAL, Philippe 10, lotissement les Alouettes F-01480 Savigneux / FR | 02 /
PHAM, Ba-Tung 6, impasse Edouard Branly F-69680 Chassieu / FR | 03 /
DELPECH, Pierre 8, rue de l'Ancienne Eglise F-69250 Fleurieu sur Saône / FR | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Booth, Catherine Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Booth, Catherine Louise Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Booth, Catherine Louise Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05794031.4 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005US31630 | Priority number, date | US20040957181 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: US 957181 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006039066 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1802924 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802924 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F25B45/00, // F25B6/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
F25B45/00 (EP,US);
F25B2400/0403 (EP,US);
F25B2400/16 (EP,US);
F25B2400/19 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2523 (EP,US);
F25B2700/21163 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/27] | F25B45/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [2010/15] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LADUNGSVERWALTUNG FÜR 100%-WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSEINHEITEN | [2007/27] | English: | CHARGE MANAGEMENT FOR 100% HEAT RECOVERY UNITS | [2007/27] | French: | GESTION DE LA CHARGE POUR DES UNITES DE RECUPERATION TOTALE DE LA CHALEUR | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 10.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Request for further processing for: | 28.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | [2013/08] |
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60114669 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 7-12* the whole document *; | [X]US5784892 (REEDY WAYNE P [US]) [X] 7-12 * column 2, line 66 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1300637 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [X] 7-12 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0057]; figures 3-8 * | International search | [A]US5479788 (ROEGNER JERRY J [US]); | [A]US5497629 (RAFALOVICH ALEXANDER P [US], et al); | [A]US5806328 (MUSTON ROBERT L [AU], et al) |