Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1809763
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.07.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
31.03.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.09.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.05.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.11.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
26.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
23.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
22.06.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
31.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|