EP1812380 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYISOCYANATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESING, Martin Ostpreussenstr. 7 67165 Waldsee / DE | 02 /
VOSS, Hartwig Weinbietring 19 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
STROEFER, Eckhard Karl-Kuntz-Weg 9 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
ROHDE, Thorsten Föhrenweg 31 68305 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
WÖLFERT, Andreas Kärlegartenstr. 12 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [2007/31] | Application number, filing date | 05794877.0 | 22.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005EP11367 | Priority number, date | DE20041053661 | 03.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053661 | [2007/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006048141 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812380 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C263/10, C07C265/12, C07C265/14 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C07C263/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07C263/18 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/10, C07C265/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYISOCYANATEN | [2007/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYISOCYANATES | [2007/31] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES POLYISOCYANATES | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/34] | 02.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10120642 ; | [X]JP2001172249 ; | [X]US2004024244 (WALSDORFF CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-7* paragraph [0034]; claims 1-10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10120642 A 19980512 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001172249 A 20010626 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * abstract * |