EP1793893 - NEUROSTIMULATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spinal Modulation, Inc. 1390 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states Spinal Modulation Inc. 1390 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | ||
For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University Office of Technology Licensing 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | |||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Spinal Modulation Inc. 1390 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Daniel, H. 411 Los Ninos Way Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
IMRAN, Mir, A. 12894 Brendel Drive Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
KIM, Daniel, H. 411 Los Ninos Way Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
IMRAN, Mir, A. 26641 Laurel Lane Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Booth, Catherine Louise Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2010/31] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Dee, Ian Mark Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Dee, Ian Mark Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk GB-Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05794902.6 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US31960 | Priority number, date | US20040608357P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 608357 P | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006029257 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793893 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61M25/06 (US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61N1/0558 (EP,US);
A61N1/36067 (EP,US);
A61N1/36139 (EP,US);
A61N1/36171 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1003 (US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUROSTIMULATIONSVERFAHREN UND SYSTEME | [2007/24] | English: | NEUROSTIMULATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2007/24] | French: | METHODES ET SYSTEMES DE NEUROSTIMULATION | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 25.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/51] | 11.07.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/51] | Appeal following examination | 10.09.2013 | Appeal received No. T2081/13 | 10.09.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.10.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5358514 (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6205359 (BOVEJA BIRINDER BOB [US]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [Y] 11-20; | [Y]US2003144709 (ZABARA JACOB [US], et al) [Y] 11-15,20 * paragraphs [0058] , [0081] *; | [Y]US2003181958 (DOBAK JOHN D [US]) [Y] 16-19* paragraph [0050]; figure 6 * | International search | [X]US6871099 (WHITEHURST TODD K [US], et al); | [Y]US6978180 (TADLOCK CHARLES H [US]); | [Y]US5299569 (WERNICKE JOACHIM F [US], et al); | [Y]US6611715 (BOVEJA BIRINDER R [US]); | [Y]US6493588 (MALANEY JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US6438423 (REZAI ALI R [US], et al); | [Y]US6045532 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al); | [Y]US6120467 (SCHALLHORN RICK [US]) | Examination | US5824021 | US6356786 | by applicant | US2002116030 | US5358514 | US6205359 | US6438423 | US2003144709 | US2003181958 |