EP1796815 - REMOVABLE AIR FILTER SYSTEM FOR COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ETTER, Mark, A. 827 Mary Key Drive Humboldt, TN 38343 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05794981.0 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005US32160 | Priority number, date | US20040607931P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 607931 P | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006029317 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1796815 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D50/00, B01D46/00, B01D59/50, F04B35/06 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F04B39/16 (EP,US);
B01D46/0004 (EP,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/10 (EP,US);
B01D46/88 (EP,US);
F02M35/02 (EP,US);
F04B35/06 (EP,US);
F04B41/02 (EP,US);
B01D2267/30 (EP,US);
B01D2275/205 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | B01D50/00, B01D46/00, B01D59/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTFERNBARES LUFTFILTERSYSTEM FÜR KOMPRESSOREN | [2007/25] | English: | REMOVABLE AIR FILTER SYSTEM FOR COMPRESSORS | [2007/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE FILTRES A AIR AMOVIBLES POUR COMPRESSEURS | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4022550 (BRINK ROBERT A, et al) [Y] 1,5 * figures 1,2,4 * * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 4, line 3 - line 20 *; | [Y]DE3806289 (BAUER KOMPRESSOREN [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5,7-10,12 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 5 - line 12 *; | [Y]US5368621 (POOL STEPHEN R [US]) [Y] 1,3-5,7-10,12 * column 2, line 35 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO0170374 (AMERICAN FARM IMPLEMENT & SPEC [US]) [Y] 1,5 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP1222951 (WALKER FILTRATION LTD [GB]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0026] ** figure 2 *; | [X]US6669451 (WALL THOMAS M [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7-10,12 * column 4, line 19 - line 23 * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 35 * * column 6, line 32 - column 8, line 10 * * figures 3-8 * | International search | [Y]US6524361 (THORNTON GERRY F [US], et al); | [Y]US2175195 (IRVINE JAN S) |