Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005285170B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2011 | B2 | AU2005285170 | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | WO2005US31932 | 07.09.2005 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1812308 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | WO2005US31932 | 07.09.2005 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0420103D0 | 13.10.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0424716D0 | 08.12.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ554404 | 29.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | WO2005US31932 | 07.09.2005 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ586810 | 30.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ55440405 | 07.09.2005 | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006031579 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR050735 | 15.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2381971 | 20.02.2010 | C2 | RU2007113161 | 20.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI290119B | 21.11.2007 | B | TW200628372 | 16.08.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0420103 | 10.09.2004 | GB0424716 | 09.11.2004 |