EP1812308 - TOP-GRIPPING CARRIER WITH INTERLOCKED PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems, LLC 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states MeadWestvaco Packaging Systems LLC 11013 West Broad Street Glen Allen, VA 23060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUCLAIR, Jean-Michel 230, Route de Chatellerault F-36000 Chateauroux / FR | 02 /
LEBRAS, Philippe 13, rue de la Bièvre F-36000 Chateauroux / FR | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Baldwin, Mark, et al Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/31] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05795196.4 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005US31932 | Priority number, date | GB20040020103 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0420103 | GB20040024716 | 09.11.2004 Original published format: GB 0424716 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006031579 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812308 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/46 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
B65D71/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEN OBERTEIL VON ARTIKELN UNTERGREIFENDER TRÄGER MIT MITEINANDER VERRIEGELTEN TAFELN | [2007/31] | English: | TOP-GRIPPING CARRIER WITH INTERLOCKED PANELS | [2007/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT A PREHENSION PAR LE HAUT COMPOSE DE PANNEAUX INTERVERROUILLES | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 19.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXAY]US4432579 (DENMARK ET AL) [DX] 10,15-18 * column 6, line 15 - line 47; figures 17,19 * [A] 1-9 [Y] 11,19,21,23,25,26; | [Y]US3501082 (JOSEPH H. LOCK) [Y] 11,19,21,23,25,26 * column 2, line 8 - line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003006150 (SAULAS ALAIN ET AL) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038]; figure 5 *; | [A]US5667070 (MIRET ET AL) [A] 1-26 * column 2, line 18 - line 44; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002113449 (BAKX MARTINUS C.M ET AL) [A] 1-26 * paragraphs [0037] - [0045]; figure 10 * |