EP1826251 - INK, INK CARTRIDGE AND INKJET RECORDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakashinden, Hiroyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Echizen, Kenji c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/35] | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795239.2 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005JP19461 | Priority number, date | JP20040307267 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004307267 | [2007/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006043695 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826251 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41M5/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (KR);
B41J2/01 (KR);
B41M5/0023 (EP,US);
B41M5/50 (KR);
B41M5/52 (KR);
C09D11/324 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/04] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTE,TINTENPATRONE UND TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/35] | English: | INK, INK CARTRIDGE AND INKJET RECORDING METHOD | [2007/35] | French: | ENCRE, CARTOUCHE D' ENCRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT PAR IMPRESSION À JET D ENCRE | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2007 | Translation filed | 11.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 22.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004061023 ; | [X]JPH0345379 ; | [X]EP0947567 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002083866 (ARITA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003010252 (ARITA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1457533 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004179066 (ARITA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 53, Database accession no. 2004-553362, XP002453433 & WO2004061023 A1 20040722 (CANON KK) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 14, Database accession no. 1991-099655, XP002453434 & JPH0345379 A 19910226 (CANON KK) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0345379 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2003094749 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2004249561 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2004058351 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2000336290 (GEN CO LTD); | [A]JPH10237370 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH07173419 (CANON KK) |