EP1796613 - TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF HYDROPHOBIC BIOACTIVE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dermatrends, Inc. 420 North Fifth Street Suite 990 Minneapolis MN 55401 / US | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Tsung-Min 1117 Marquette Ave., Apt. 1107 Minneapolis, MN 55403 / US | 02 /
HICKEY, Alan T.J. 12310 Singletree Lane Apt. 2439 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | 03 /
JACOBSON, Eric C. 4960 Lillian Street San Diego, CA 92110 / US | 04 /
GRICENKO, Nicole T. 5707 Highway 7, Apt 403 Saint Louis Park, MN 55416 / US | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp, Dörries, Frank-Molnia & Pohlman, Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795246.7 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005US31825 | Priority number, date | US20040607922P | 08.09.2004 Original published format: US 607922 P | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006029192 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796613 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, A61K9/70, A61K47/18 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K47/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | A61K6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSDERMALE ABGABE VON HYDROPHOBEN BIOLOGISCH WIRKSAMEN MITTELN | [2007/25] | English: | TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF HYDROPHOBIC BIOACTIVE AGENTS | [2007/25] | French: | ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE D'AGENTS BIOACTIFS HYDROPHOBES | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 11.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 30.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.2009 | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02074286 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,8,14-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0032] , [0053] , [0055] * * example 1 *; | [X]US2003215487 (KIM DONG-YEUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0021] , [0029] *; | [X]US2004043171 (AUDETT JAY DOUGLAS [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9,13-17* paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0011] - [0055] , [0057] - [0059] - [0076] *; | [E]EP1685830 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,3,4,8,10,14-17 * paragraphs [0032] , [0034] , [0035] , [0040] , [0046] , [0054] , [0055] * * table 1 * | International search | [X]US2004136924 (BOYD THOMAS J [US], et al) |