EP1787194 - STORE INSTRUCTION ORDERING FOR MULTI-CORE PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cavium, Inc. 2315 N. First Street San Jose CA 95131 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/33] | For all designated states Cavium, Inc. 805 East Middlefield Road Mt. View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Cavium Networks, Inc. 805 East Middlefield Road Mt. View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Cavium Networks 2610 Augustine Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHER, David, H. 62 Highland View Drive Sutton, MA 01590 / US | 02 /
KESSLER, Richard, E. 30 Thestland Drive Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 03 /
LEE, Yen 1065 Windsor Street San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | ||
Former [2007/21] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05795368.9 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005US31710 | Priority number, date | US20040609211P | 10.09.2004 Original published format: US 609211 P | US20040002728 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: US 2728 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006031511 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1787194 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787194 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
G06F9/3004 (EP,US);
G06F9/30087 (EP,US);
G06F9/30181 (EP);
G06F9/3824 (EP,US);
G06F9/3834 (EP,US);
G06F9/3854 (EP,US);
G06F9/3858 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/43] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPEICHERBEFEHLSANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN MULTIKERNPROZESSOR | [2007/21] | English: | STORE INSTRUCTION ORDERING FOR MULTI-CORE PROCESSOR | [2007/21] | French: | ORDRE D'INSTRUCTIONS DE STOCKAGE DE PROCESSEUR MULTI-COEUR | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2005 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5524220 (VERMA DEEPAK [US], et al); | [X]US5990913 (HARRIMAN DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US2002188817 (NORDEN ERIK K [US], et al); | [A]US2003033491 (HENRY G GLENN [US], et al) | Examination | US5956503 | US6594741 |