EP1799052 - METHODS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF NUTRITIONAL PRODUCTS HAVING IMPROVED QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | NUTRITIONAL PRODUCTS HAVING IMPROVED QUALITY AND METHODS AND SYSTEMS REGARDING SAME | ||
[2010/31] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GR | published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2020/02] |
Former [2019/28] | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states NESTEC S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRATKY, Zdenek 1 Rodney Lane New Milford, CT 06776 / US | 02 /
HASCHKE, Ferdinand Nestle House, Lyoner Strasse 23 D-60523 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
GERMAN, John Bruce Résidence La Bergerie CH-1072 Forel / CH | 04 /
STEVEN, Matthew Hünigenstrasse 1c CH-3504 Niederhünigen / CH | 05 /
BUETLER, Timo Av De Morges 9 CH-1004 Lausanne / CH | 06 /
BAUER, Werner Route de Lavaux 254 1095 Lutry / CH | [2010/33] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
KRATKY, Zdenek 1 Rodney Lane New Milford, CT 06776 / US | ||
02 /
HASCHKE, Ferdinand Néstle House, Lyoner Strasse 23 D-60523 Franckfurt / DE | |||
03 /
GERMAN, John Bruce Résidence La Bergerie CH-1072 Forel / CH | |||
04 /
STEVEN, Matthew Hünigenstrasse 1c CH-3504 Niederhünigen / CH | |||
05 /
BUETLER, Timo Av De Morges 9 CH-1004 Lausanne / CH | |||
06 /
BAUER, Werner Route de Lavaux 254 1095 Lutry / CH | Representative(s) | Künzi, Sophie, et al Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2020/02] |
Former [2012/26] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2011/49] | Cogniat, Eric Jean Marie Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2010/28] | Corticchiato, Olivier Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2007/26] | Dixon, Sarah Avenue Nestlé, 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 05795459.6 | 09.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US32116 | Priority number, date | US20040608635P | 09.09.2004 Original published format: US 608635 P | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006029298 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799052 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799052 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1799052 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/305 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A23L3/46 (EP,US);
A23L3/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSMETHODEN FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL MIT VERBESSERTER QUALITÄT | [2010/31] | English: | METHODS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF NUTRITIONAL PRODUCTS HAVING IMPROVED QUALITY | [2010/31] | French: | METHODES DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS NUTRITIONNELS DE MEILLEURE QUALITE | [2010/31] |
Former [2007/26] | NAHRUNGSMITTEL MIT VERBESSERTER QUALITÄT SOWIE DIESBZÜGLICHE METHODEN UND SYSTEME | ||
Former [2007/26] | NUTRITIONAL PRODUCTS HAVING IMPROVED QUALITY AND METHODS AND SYSTEMS REGARDING SAME | ||
Former [2007/26] | PRODUITS NUTRITIONNELS DE MEILLEURE QUALITE ET PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES ASSOCIES | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10168850.5 / EP2238842 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
05.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al, et al Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | 02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina IP Department, et al, et al IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 03
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
05.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al, et al 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | ||
02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V., et al, et al IP Department P.O. Box 238 Bronland 20 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | |||
03
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | |||
Former [2016/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
05.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant, et al, et al Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus, et al, et al FrieslandCampina Innovation Centre Intellectual Property Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | |||
03
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | |||
Former [2015/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
05.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant, et al, et al Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative V.O., et al, et al P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | |||
03
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | |||
Former [2014/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
05.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Boult Wade Tennant, et al, et al Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
03
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | |||
Former [2013/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
05.10.2011
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
03
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al, et al P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | |||
Former [2011/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US Opponent's representative Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
02
22.09.2011
27.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al, et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | |||
03
22.09.2011
ADMISSIBLE N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL Opponent's representative van Duijvenbode, René Cornelis Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | 03.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.07.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.12.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T1395/15 | 20.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 09.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | IE | 09.09.2011 | LU | 09.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | FI | 09.09.2016 | IT | 09.09.2016 | PT | 09.03.2017 | PL | 09.09.2017 | SE | 10.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | [2020/38] |
Former [2019/32] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FI | 09.09.2016 | ||
IT | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GR | 11.04.2017 | ||
PL | 09.09.2017 | ||
SE | 10.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FI | 09.09.2016 | ||
IT | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GR | 11.04.2017 | ||
PL | 09.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FI | 09.09.2016 | ||
IT | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GR | 11.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FI | 09.09.2016 | ||
IT | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
GR | 11.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
FI | 09.09.2016 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2013/45] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
HU | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.09.2011 | ||
LU | 09.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 22.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08256682 ; | [X]DE2829036 (FRESENIUS CHEM PHARM IND) [X] 1-5,7,10-19,21-28 * page 3, paragraphs 7,8 * * page 4, paragraphs 1-3 * * examples 1-4 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US4640840 (ASSINDER IVAR [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,9-28 * column 1, lines 5-8,36-65 * * column 2, lines 11-16,57 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 18 * * examples I-III * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US4670261 (SAMEJIMA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10-13,21,29-31 * column 2, lines 16-21 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 15 * * column 5, lines 51-60 * * examples 1-5 * * column 5, lines 51-60 * [A] 32-35; | [XA]US4921877 (CASHMERE KAREN A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9-14,16-31 * column 1, lines 9-13 * * column 3, lines 42-48 * * column 4, line 39 - column 7, line 12 * * column 5, lines 56-60 * [A] 32-35; | [XA]US5503865 (BEHRINGER REINHARD [CH], et al) [X] 1-7,9-28 * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 43 * * column 5, lines 5-23 * [A] 32-35; | [X]US5888568 (CHERIAN GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 22,23,26 * column 1, lines 4-7,35-42,49-57 * * example 2 *; | [XA]US5972367 (INOUE TADAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10-19,21 * column 1, lines 8-15 * * column 2, lines 28-34 * * column 3, lines 11-60 * * column 6, lines 20-30,54-58 * * column 8, line 16 - column 10, line 64 * * figures 1,2 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 30-35; | [A]US6395508 (SHIMAMURA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-35* column 21, lines 16-26 *; | [XA]US6436464 (EUBER JOHN [US]) [X] 1-5,7-13,20,21,29-31 * column 2, lines 32-35,39-41,43,44 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 7 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 1 * * example 1 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 1 * [A] 14-19,32-35 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08256682 A 19961008 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD) [X] 1-6,9-11,13,20 * abstract * |