EP1813596 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALPHA, ALPHA- DIFLUOROAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8-banchi, Nishi 5 cho-me, Kita 8 jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 0600808 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. Mitsubishi Building, 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUHARA, T. Graduate School Eng., Nat. Uni. Corp. Hokkaido Uni. Nishi 8-chome Kita 13-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0813 / JP | 02 /
HARA, Shoji Graduate School Eng. Nat. Uni. Corp. Hokkaido Uni. Nishi 8-chome Kita 13-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi / JP | 03 /
HIDAKA, Toshio Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795464.6 | 20.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005JP19283 | Priority number, date | JP20040322987 | 05.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004322987 | [2007/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006049014 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813596 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/74, C07C211/29, C07C213/00, C07C217/58, C07D295/06, C07D233/02 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C07C209/74 (EP,US);
C07C213/08 (EP,US);
C07D233/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/74, C07C211/29 (EP,US);
C07C213/08, C07C217/58 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [2007/33] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG VON ALPHA, ALPHA-DIFLUORAMIN | [2007/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ALPHA, ALPHA- DIFLUOROAMINE | [2007/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE D'UNE ALPHA, ALPHA-DIFLUOROAMINE | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2007 | Translation filed | 30.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0895991 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-6* page 16, paragraphs 28,33 *; | [A]EP1437342 (BAYER CHEMICALS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, paragraph 53 - page 7, paragraph 56 * * page 10 - page 12; example -; table 2 *; | [X] - L.M. YAGUPOLSKII, "N,N-Bis(difluoromethyl)anilines", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, vol. 76, (1996), pages 95 - 98, URL: http://www.elsevier.com/wps/find/journaldescription.cws_home/504088/description#description, XP002568785 [X] 1-6 * page 96, column R, paragraph LAST - page 97, column R, paragraph 2; table 3 * | International search | [Y]JPH069480 (BAYER AG); | [Y]JPH07292490 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]JPH1149742 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JP2004231646 (BAYER CHEMICALS AG) |