EP1804242 - OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMAI, Takashi, c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 12-1, Ohgi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | 02 /
USAMI, Yoshihisa, c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 200, Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418-8666 / JP | 03 /
KATAYAMA, Kazutoshi, c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 12-1, Ohgi-cho 2-chome Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0001 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Siegert, Georg, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Siegert, Georg, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795549.4 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005JP19140 | Priority number, date | JP20040303006 | 18.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004303006 | [2007/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006043564 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804242 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
G11B7/24079 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/04] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/27] | English: | OPTICAL INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2007/27] | French: | SUPPORT D ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE D INFORMATIONS ET PROCEDE POUR FABRIQUER CELUI-CI | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2007 | Translation filed | 16.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 12.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003341241 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003338083 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2004158145 (TDK CORP); | [A]JP2004171724 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH01133229 (HITACHI LTD, et al) |