EP1806742 - OPTICAL DISC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Katsuya Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIKAWA, Akira Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Shin-ichi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 04 /
MINAMINO, Junichi Matsushita Electric Industrial Co.Ltd. 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7,Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05795883.7 | 20.10.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005JP19331 | Priority number, date | JP20040309381 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004309381 | [2007/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046469 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806742 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1806742 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/005 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
G11B7/0948 (EP,US);
G11B7/0941 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/38] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE DATENTRÄGEREINRICHTUNG | [2007/28] | English: | OPTICAL DISC DEVICE | [2007/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF À DISQUE OPTIQUE | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2007 | Translation filed | 30.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 26.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1139657 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH11161977 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [Y]JPH09320068 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [Y]JPH10269590 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [X]JPH1139657 (TOSHIBA CORP) |