Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8112832 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2012 | B2 | US2007261167 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP10859 | 08.10.2005 | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008516118 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP10859 | 08.10.2005 | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1799920 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2008 | B1 | EP1799920 | 27.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP10859 | 08.10.2005 | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101035953B | 05.05.2010 | B | CN101035953 | 12.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP10859 | 08.10.2005 | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005005647D1 | 20.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP10859 | 08.10.2005 | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1106808 | 20.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005EP10859 | 08.10.2005 | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006040102 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE410558T | 15.10.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004049736 | 17.09.2009 | B4 | DE102004049736 | 22.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004049736 | 13.10.2004 |