EP1799920 - ATTACHMENT OF A SANITARY WASHSTAND FITTING TO A WASHSTAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANSA METALLWERKE AG Sigmaringer Strasse 107 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECKER, Hans-Hermann Tachenhäuser Str. 57 72644 Oberboihingen / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05796207.8 | 08.10.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005EP10859 | Priority number, date | DE20041049736 | 13.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049736 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040102 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799920 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799920 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
E03C1/0401 (EP,US);
E03C2001/0416 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNG EINER SANITÄREN WASCHTISCHARMATUR AN EINEM WASCHTISCH | [2007/26] | English: | ATTACHMENT OF A SANITARY WASHSTAND FITTING TO A WASHSTAND | [2007/26] | French: | FIXATION D'UNE ARMATURE DE LAVABO SANITAIRE A UN LAVABO | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IE | 08.10.2008 | LT | 08.10.2008 | LU | 08.10.2008 | LV | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | PL | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | ES | 19.01.2009 | IS | 08.02.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | [2016/26] |
Former [2011/02] | CY | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CY | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
TR | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 08.10.2008 | |
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | SI | 08.10.2008 | |
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5681060 (BERG MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 3 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6328059 (TESTORI ALESSANDRO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column 5, line 4 - line 21; figure 4 *; | [A]US2002079701 (LEHNER MICHAEL [CH]) [A] 3 * figures 3-5 *; | [A]EP1357233 (INAX CORP [JP]) [A] 3* figures 26A,26B * |