EP1794707 - INTEGRATING ELECTRONIC AND TRADITIONAL RETAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epicenter Holdings, Inc. 6 Glenville St. Greenwitch, CT 06831 / US | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORDON, Sheldon, M. 76 Winding Ln. Greenwich, CT 06831 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Scott, J. 18 Wexford Ln. Greenwitch, CT 08221 / US | 03 /
LEE, Antony, H. 27 Stiles Ln. Greenwich, CT 06831 / US | 04 /
GAMBARDELLA, Ann, L. 86 Tide Mill Ter. Fairfield, CT 06824 / US | 05 /
CUCALON, Camilo, E. 974-D Heritage Hills Somers, NY 10589 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo Invention S.r.l. Via delle Armi 1 40137 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Dall'Olio, Giancarlo INVENTION S.R.L. Via delle Armi, 1 40137 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 05796535.2 | 09.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005US32215 | Priority number, date | US20040609073P | 10.09.2004 Original published format: US 609073 P | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006031657 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1794707 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
G06Q30/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/343 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0605 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0625 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | G06K15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRATION VON ELEKTRONISCHEM UND TRADITIONELLEM EINZELHANDEL | [2007/24] | English: | INTEGRATING ELECTRONIC AND TRADITIONAL RETAIL | [2007/24] | French: | INTEGRATION MAGASIN DE VENTE ELECTRONIQUE ET TRADITIONNELLE AU DETAIL | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 13.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO0175814 (GORDON GROUP HOLDINGS LTD [US], et al) [XD] 1-22 * abstract * * page 1, line 11 - page 3, line 27 * * page 5, line 3 - line 15 ** page 11, line 26 - page 12, line L *; | [X]US6587835 (TREYZ G VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 17, line 60 - column 18, line 39 * * column 21, line 25 - column 22, line 15 * * column 26, line 41 - column 28, line 17 * * column 28, line 44 - column 29, line 33 * * figures 1,2,4 * * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line L * | International search | [X]US2002133424 (JOAO RAYMOND ANTHONY [US]); | [Y]US2002035512 (PAVLIK RONALD J [US]); | [A]US2001054009 (MILLER MICHAEL ROBERT [US], et al) |