|
25.11.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2014 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Brief communication (time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Brief communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Brief communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
157 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Request for correction of errors in filed documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.04.2007 |
Fax request to enter the European phase |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
04.04.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
23.03.2007 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.03.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
163 |