EP1809530 - FRONT STRUCTURE FOR A VEHICLE SUPPORTING A STEERING GEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2017/10] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Company Limited 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Akira 3954-1 Ohya Kureeru ai A-103 Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243-0411 / JP | 02 /
FUJIMARU, Go 5-13-2 Higashirinkan Heiz-Horn 102 Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP | 03 /
TABE, Masahiko c/o Nissan Technical Center, I.P.Department 560-2, Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | 04 /
KOBAYASHI, Tsuyoshi 46-2-14-110 Higashinaruse Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1117 / JP | 05 /
WAKANA, Gousuke c/o Nissan Technology Center, I.P.Department 560-2,Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | [2017/16] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Akira 3954-1 Ohya Kureeru ai A-103 Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243-0411 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIMARU, Go 5-13-2 Higashirinkan Heiz-Horn 102 Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP | |||
03 /
TABE, Masahiko c/o Nissan Technical Center, I.P.Department 560-2, Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | |||
04 /
KOBAYASHI, Tsuyoshi 46-2-14-110 Higashinaruse Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1117 / JP | |||
05 /
WAKANA, Gousuke c/o Nissan Technology Center, I.P.Department 560-2,Okatsukoku Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0192 / JP | |||
Former [2007/30] | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Akira 3954-1 Ohya Kureeru ai A-103 Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243-0411 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJIMARU, Go 5-13-2 Higashirinkan Heiz-Horn 102 Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP | |||
03 /
TABE, Masahiko 1-18-8-502 Tsurumaki-kita Hadano-shi, Kanagawa 228-0811 / JP | |||
04 /
KOBAYASHI, Tsuyoshi 46-2-14-110 Higashinaruse Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1117 / JP | |||
05 /
WAKANA, Gousuke 46-2-14-110 Higashinaruse Iszehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1117 / JP | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/33] | Brochard, Pascale, et al Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/30] | Holmes, Matthew William Nissan Technical Centre Europe Ltd, Intellectual Property Department, Cranfield Technology Park Bedfordshire, MK43 0DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05796777.0 | 26.10.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005IB53506 | Priority number, date | JP20040311877U | 27.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004311877 U | JP20050042921U | 18.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005042921 U | JP20050194815U | 04.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005194815 U | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006046211 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809530 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809530 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D1/16 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP,US);
B62D21/155 (EP,US);
B60G2206/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/16] |
Former [2008/05] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EIN LENKGETRIEBE STÜTZENDE FRONTSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2007/30] | English: | FRONT STRUCTURE FOR A VEHICLE SUPPORTING A STEERING GEAR | [2007/30] | French: | STRUCTURE AVANT POUR VEHICULE SUPPORTANT UN BOITIER DE DIRECTION | [2007/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 22.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5385369 (MUKAI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6,9,11 * column 7, lines 41-57; figures 4,6 *[A] 10; | [IA]EP0714824 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1,3-5 * figures 1,2,5; claim 1 * [A] 2,6-8,11,14-18; | [XA]EP1081014 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,14,15,18 * paragraphs [0117] - [0119] - [0123] , [0124]; figures 13,15,19; claim 7 * [A] 16,17 | Examination | FR2440304 | by applicant | EP0714824 | JPH08310444 | EP1081014 |