EP1807622 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL ENERGY FOR AN AGRICULTURAL OR INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARASINSKI, Nicolai Gotthilf-Salzmann-Str. 60 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
SOBOTZIK, Joachim Bürgermeister-Wingerter-Str. 26a 67245 Lambsheim / DE | 03 /
REINARDS, Marco Poststrasse 15 54608 Bleialf / DE | 04 /
KNEER, Bernd Heidelberger Str. 30 68519 Viernheim / DE | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Bradl, Joachim Deere & Company European Office Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05797040.2 | 10.10.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005EP55123 | Priority number, date | DE20041052023 | 26.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004052023 | [2007/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045692 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1807622 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/04, F02B75/06, F16F15/12, F16D3/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
A01B59/00 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L3/003 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/40 (EP,US);
F02B75/06 (EP,US);
H02K7/006 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2240/443 (EP,US);
B60L2270/145 (EP,US);
F02D29/06 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE FÜR EIN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES ODER INDUSTRIELLES NUTZFAHRZEUG | [2007/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICAL ENERGY FOR AN AGRICULTURAL OR INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL VEHICLE | [2007/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINE A PRODUIRE DE L'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE POUR UN VEHICULE UTILITAIRE INDUSTRIEL OU AGRICOLE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6561336 (HUART DAVID [FR], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 5, line 34 - column 9, line 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2925675 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE10136172 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0030] - [0045]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004058735 (KIRSCHEY GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0040] - [0046]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6655339 (ORR DAVID CHARLES [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 48; figure 1 * |