EP1828540 - GYROSCOPICALLY-ORIENTED SURVEY TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icefield Tools Corporation P.O. Box 30085 Whitehorse YT Y1A 5M2 / CA | [2010/28] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states BLAKE, Eric P.O. Box 30085 Whiterhorse YT Y1A 5M2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blake, Erik P.O. Box 30085 Whitehorse, Yukon Y1A 5M2 / CA | [2011/31] |
Former [2010/28] | 01 /
Blake, Eric P.O. Box 30085 Whitehorse, Yukon Y1A 5M2 / CA | ||
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05797147.5 | 13.10.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005CA01591 | Priority number, date | CA20042492623 | 13.12.2004 Original published format: CA 2492623 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006063432 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828540 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828540 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/022, G01C9/00, G01V9/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
E21B47/022 (EP,US);
G01V1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/12] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GYROSKOPISCH AUSGERICHTETES MESSWERKZEUG | [2007/36] | English: | GYROSCOPICALLY-ORIENTED SURVEY TOOL | [2007/36] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE CONTROLE A ORIENTATION GYROSCOPIQUE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 11.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 01.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]CA2131576 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA]); | [X]CA2372640 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]); | [A]US2003076107 (FANINI OTTO N [US], et al); | [XP]CA2476789 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) |