EP1812983 - SOLID POROUS ZINC ELECTRODES AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teck Metals Ltd. Suite 3300 550 Burrard Street Vancouver, BC V6C 0B3 / CA | [2010/08] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states TECK COMINCO METALS LTD. Suite 600, 200 Burrard Street Vancouver British Columbia V6C 3L9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xiaoge Gregory 3 Weatherell Street Toronto, Ontario M6S 1S6 / CA | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Eisenführ, Günther Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05797201.0 | 14.10.2005 | [2007/31] | WO2005CA01585 | Priority number, date | US20040976861 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 976861 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006047852 | Date: | 11.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1812983 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/00, H01M4/42, H01M4/04, H01M4/88, H01M4/26, H01M4/86 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H01M4/244 (EP,US);
H01M4/42 (EP,US);
H01M4/46 (EP,US);
H01M4/861 (EP,US);
H01M10/24 (EP,US);
H01M12/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/31] | H01M4/00, H01M4/42, H01M4/04, H01M4/88, H01M4/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE FEST-ZINKELEKTRODEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/31] | English: | SOLID POROUS ZINC ELECTRODES AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME | [2007/31] | French: | ELECTRODES EN ZINC POREUSES SOLIDES ET LEURS METHODES DE FABRICATION | [2007/31] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 01.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3674563 (BENNETT ROSWELL J) [X] 1-50 * abstract * * column 6, lines 42-53 * * column 7, line 37 - column 9, line 3 *; | [A]JPS5657258 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-50* abstract *; | [X]US5102745 (TATARCHUK BRUCE J [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 8, lines 1-17 * * column 9, lines 55-61 * * column 10, lines 47-59 *; | [X]US5395710 (IMHOF OTWIN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5518833 (REPPLINGER RONALD S [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * abstract * * column 4, lines 25-41 *; | [X]US5780186 (CASEY JR JOHN E [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 39-58 * | International search | [X]US3853625 (LOUZOS D); | [X]US2002142202 (LI LIN-FENG [US], et al); | [A]US2003170543 (HEADRICK JON W [US], et al) | Examination | US3672998 | by applicant | US6284410 | US6521378 | US6221527 | WO0156098 | US2003203281 | US5599637 | US5206096 | US3853625 | US5584109 | US2002142202 | US2003170543 | US4226920 | WO0124292 | US6673494 | US6022639 | US3674563 | US3672998 | - KORDESCH, "Batteries", MANGANESE DIOXIDE, vol. 1 |